NJ A1669 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5419
Note: Carry Over of previous S3884
Note: Carry Over of previous S3884
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes obstacles to teacher certification for certain teachers.
Title
Removes obstacles to teacher certification for certain teachers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-2-0) |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5419 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S3884 (Carry Over) 2023-05-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S1287 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S3884 (Carry Over) 2023-05-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S1287 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee