NJ A1662 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1055
Note: Carry Foward to future S473
Note: Carry Over of previous A4870
Note: Carry Over of previous S1454
Note: Carry Foward to future S473
Note: Carry Over of previous A4870
Note: Carry Over of previous S1454
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows shore municipalities to provide spouse and dependent children of veterans free or reduced cost access to beaches.
Title
Allows shore municipalities to provide spouse and dependent children of veterans free or reduced cost access to beaches.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1662 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1662 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A4870 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1454 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S894 (Same As) 2022-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A1662 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A4870 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1454 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S894 (Same As) 2022-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee