NJ A1657 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4086
Note: Carry Over of previous S2003
Note: Carry Over of previous S2003
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain mental health professionals working in school districts to refer or help facilitate referral of students to private professional counselors.
Title
Permits certain mental health professionals working in school districts to refer or help facilitate referral of students to private professional counselors.
Sponsors
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Sterley Stanley [D] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4086 (Carry Over) 2022-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2003 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2380 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2003 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S2380 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A1657 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A2000/1657_I1.HTM |