NJ A1636 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A432
Note: Carry Over of previous A1047
Note: Carry Over of previous A1047
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for appointment to board of directors of New Jersey Automobile Insurance Risk Exchange by Commissioner of Banking and Insurance.
Title
Provides for appointment to board of directors of New Jersey Automobile Insurance Risk Exchange by Commissioner of Banking and Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1636 (Carry Over) 2016-09-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1047 (Carry Over) 2014-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1047 (Carry Over) 2014-02-27 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee