NJ A1627 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A536

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.96.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that PERS or PFRS member who continues to be volunteer firefighter or emergency services worker after retirement with employer from whom member retires has bona fide severance for compliance with State and federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that PERS or PFRS member who continues to be volunteer firefighter or emergency services worker after retirement with employer from whom member retires has bona fide severance for compliance with State and federal law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1873 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.96.
2018-06-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2018-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted for S1873 (1R)
2018-06-21SenateSenate Amendment (31-0) (Sarlo)
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-12SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
2018-02-08AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A536 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2107 (2R)
S1873 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A1627 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback