NJ S1873 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Legislation replaced by A1627

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A1627 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that PERS or PFRS member who continues to be volunteer firefighter or emergency services worker after retirement with employer from whom member retires has bona fide severance for compliance with State and federal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that PERS or PFRS member who continues to be volunteer firefighter or emergency services worker after retirement with employer from whom member retires has bona fide severance for compliance with State and federal law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted by A1627 (1R)
2018-06-21SenateSenate Amendment (34-0) (Sarlo)
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3611 (Same As) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1627 (Replaced by) 2018-08-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.96.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback