NJ A1562 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1504
Note: Carry Foward to future A3878
Note: Carry Foward to future S1206
Note: Carry Over of previous A1041
Note: Carry Over of previous S3524
Note: Carry Foward to future A3878
Note: Carry Foward to future S1206
Note: Carry Over of previous A1041
Note: Carry Over of previous S3524
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits issuance of motorcycle endorsement to certain out-of-State military personnel.
Title
Permits issuance of motorcycle endorsement to certain out-of-State military personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-08 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1562 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1562 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1562 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1041 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1994 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3524 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1562 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1562 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1041 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1994 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3524 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee