NJ A1561 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-16 - Approved P.L.2011, c.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-16 - Approved P.L.2011, c.128.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits diversionary program for juveniles who are criminally charged for "sexting" or posting sexual images.*
Title
Permits diversionary program for juveniles who are criminally charged for "sexting" or posting sexual images.*
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. John Girgenti [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-16 | Approved P.L.2011, c.128. | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by the Senate (39-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Substituted for S2700 (SCS) | |
2011-06-27 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-06-13 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) | |
2011-01-24 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2700 (Same As) 2011-06-29 - Substituted by A1591 (2R)