NJ A15 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Approved P.L.2019, c.32.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Raises, over time, hourly minimum wage to $15.00.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Raises, over time, hourly minimum wage to $15.00.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S15 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.32.
2019-01-31SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-16)
2019-01-31SenateSubstituted for S15
2019-01-31SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (52-25-0)
2019-01-31AssemblyMotion To Table (Pintor Marin) (52-23-0)
2019-01-31AssemblyMotion To As (Wirths)
2019-01-28AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-24AssemblyReported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-12-06AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S15 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by A15 (ACS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback