NJ A1484 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4928
Note: Carry Over of previous S1595
Note: Carry Over of previous S1595
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates task force to study feasibility of paperless State government.
Title
Creates task force to study feasibility of paperless State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4928 (Carry Over) 2022-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1595 (Carry Over) 2022-10-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2407 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S1595 (Carry Over) 2022-10-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2407 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee