NJ A1483 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S697
Note: Carry Foward to future A1539
Note: Carry Over of previous A590
Note: Carry Over of previous S1708
Note: Carry Foward to future A1539
Note: Carry Over of previous A590
Note: Carry Over of previous S1708
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates pay-off of trade-in vehicles and certain vehicle title releases.
Title
Regulates pay-off of trade-in vehicles and certain vehicle title releases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1483 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1483 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A590 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1588 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1708 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1483 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A590 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1588 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1708 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee