NJ A1449 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A411
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.464.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.464.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides job security to certain organ and bone marrow donors.
Title
Provides job security to certain organ and bone marrow donors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3168 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.464. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0) |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted for S3168 |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A411 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3168 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A1449
S3168 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A1449