NJ A1404 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5015

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Motion To Table (Greenwald) (44-24-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revises gross income tax rates for joint filers and similar taxpayers and designated as Marriage Penalty Elimination Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises gross income tax rates for joint filers and similar taxpayers and designated as Marriage Penalty Elimination Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07AssemblyMotion To Table (Greenwald) (44-24-0)
2018-06-07AssemblyMotion To Relieve from AAP (Bucco)
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5015 (Carry Over) 2017-06-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2190 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback