NJ A1359 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2843
Note: Carry Foward to future S3481
Note: Carry Over of previous A4275
Note: Carry Over of previous S2574
Note: Carry Foward to future S3481
Note: Carry Over of previous A4275
Note: Carry Over of previous S2574
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes creation of Woman Veteran license plates.
Title
Authorizes creation of Woman Veteran license plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1359 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1359 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4275 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2574 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1359 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4275 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2574 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee