NJ A128 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2593
Note: Carry Over of previous A4281
Note: Carry Over of previous A4281
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S1697
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S1697
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts fuel used for operation of certain school buses from petroleum products gross receipts tax and motor fuel tax; clarifies tax treatment of certain dyed fuel thereunder; clarifies determination of taxable estates of certain decedents.*
Title
Exempts fuel used for operation of certain school buses from petroleum products gross receipts tax and motor fuel tax; clarifies tax treatment of certain dyed fuel thereunder; clarifies determination of taxable estates of certain decedents.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S1697 |
2018-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A128 (Carry Over) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S1697
A4281 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1967 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.127.
S1697 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A4281 (Carry Over) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1967 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.127.
S1697 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate