NJ A1271 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A4829
Note: Carry Over of previous A1349
Note: Carry Over of previous A1349
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures to prevent and eradicate bedbug infestations in certain residential property.
Title
Establishes procedures to prevent and eradicate bedbug infestations in certain residential property.
Sponsors
Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1271 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A1349 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1295 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1349 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1295 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee