NJ A12 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on October 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-14 - Approved P.L.2016, c.57.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on October 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-14 - Approved P.L.2016, c.57.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adjusts certain State taxes to support strengthened investments in public and private assets in this State.*
Title
Adjusts certain State taxes to support strengthened investments in public and private assets in this State.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2411 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-29 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Add to Calendar (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2411 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-07-29 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Add to Calendar (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-14 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2016, c.57. |
2016-10-07 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-27-0) |
2016-10-07 | Assembly | Motion Table Motion (Greenwald) (Voice) |
2016-10-07 | Assembly | Motion To Recommit AAP (Ciattarelli) |
2016-10-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2016-10-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-14) |
2016-10-07 | Senate | Motion To Table (20-13) (Weinberg) |
2016-10-07 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Beck) |
2016-10-07 | Senate | Substituted for S2411 (3R) |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment (22-10) (Sarlo) |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Motion To Table (19-9) (Weinberg) |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Motion To Sa (Beck) |
2016-07-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (53-23-0) |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Emergency Resolution (Prieto) (61-15-0) |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Motion Add to calendar (Prieto) (56-19-0) |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S2411 (Same As) 2016-10-07 - Substituted by A12 (2R)