NJ A1199 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.205.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Permits a victim or witness of any age to testify by closed circuit television under certain circumstances in prosecutions for domestic violence, sexual assault, and certain other crimes.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits a victim or witness of any age to testify by closed circuit television under certain circumstances in prosecutions for domestic violence, sexual assault, and certain other crimes.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1326 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.205.
2017-06-26SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2017-06-26SenateSubstituted for S1326 (1R)
2016-09-26SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2016-09-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2016-05-26AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (McKeon)
2016-04-04AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-03-07AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2154 (Carry Over) 2014-09-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1326 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A1199 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback