NJ A1185 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous A3863
Note: Carry Over of previous S3155

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-02-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Upgrades offense of prostitution as patron; directs fines collected to "Human Trafficking Survivor's Assistance Fund."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Upgrades offense of prostitution as patron; directs fines collected to "Human Trafficking Survivor's Assistance Fund."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2025-02-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2025-02-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2025-02-13AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2025-02-13AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2024-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Public Safety and Preparedness Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3863 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S3155 (Carry Over) 2022-10-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S4123 (Same As) 2025-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback