NJ A118 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3374
Note: Carry Over of previous S1477
Note: Carry Over of previous S1477
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides credits under corporation business tax and gross income tax for qualified wages of certain disabled veterans.
Title
Provides credits under corporation business tax and gross income tax for qualified wages of certain disabled veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2301 (Same As) 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3374 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1477 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3374 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1477 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A118 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A0500/118_I1.HTM |