NJ A1059 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1170
Note: Carry Foward to future S3678
Note: Carry Over of previous A4866
Note: Carry Over of previous S3387
Note: Carry Foward to future S3678
Note: Carry Over of previous A4866
Note: Carry Over of previous S3387
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education to maintain supply of opioid antidotes and permits emergency administration of opioid antidote by campus medical professional or trained employee.
Title
Requires institutions of higher education to maintain supply of opioid antidotes and permits emergency administration of opioid antidote by campus medical professional or trained employee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1059 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A1059 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4866 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3698 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S3387 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A1059 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4866 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3698 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S3387 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1059 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1059_I1.HTM |