NJ A1058 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1169
Note: Carry Foward to future S1459
Note: Carry Over of previous A4427
Note: Carry Foward to future S1459
Note: Carry Over of previous A4427
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires discrimination prevention training for certain providers of services to senior citizens.
Title
Requires discrimination prevention training for certain providers of services to senior citizens.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-1-2) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1058 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1058 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4427 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3552 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1058 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4427 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3552 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee