NJ A1032 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2633
Note: Carry Over of previous A496
Note: Carry Over of previous A4546
Note: Carry Over of previous A496
Note: Carry Over of previous A4546
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows gross income tax deduction for charitable contributions to certain New Jersey-based charitable organizations.
Title
Allows gross income tax deduction for charitable contributions to certain New Jersey-based charitable organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1032 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A496 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A4546 (Carry Over) 2020-08-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A2532 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S2013 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A496 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A4546 (Carry Over) 2020-08-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A2532 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S2013 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1032 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1500/1032_I1.HTM |