NH SCR2 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to discontinue foreign aid to Argentina until financial disputes are resolved.
Title
Urging Congress to discontinue foreign aid to Argentina until financial disputes are resolved.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-06-03 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1947 |
2015-05-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-05-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jun 3 (Vote 8-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1639-1640 |
2015-04-30 | House | Executive Session: 4/30/2015 Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-04-23 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 4/30/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-04-07 | House | Public Hearing: 4/23/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303==RECESSED== |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sen. D’Allesandro Moved to Remove Senate Calendar R 2 from the Consent Calendar |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/26/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Hearing: 3/18/15, Room 100, State House, 2:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs by the necessary 2/3 vote, Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-26; Senate Journal 4 |