NH SCR2 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2289
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2289
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regarding the White Mountain National Forest.
Title
Regarding the White Mountain National Forest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.2289 | |
2012-05-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 15 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 37, PG.2035 | |
2012-04-18 | House Executive Session: 5/8/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2012-04-04 | House Public Hearing: 4/10/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 ==Full Committee Work Session May Follow== | |
2012-02-08 | House Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 15, PG.907 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0561s, 0615s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4, Pg.107 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2012-0615s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 4, Pg.107 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Committee Amendment 0561s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 4, Pg.106 | |
2012-02-02 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-0561s, 2/8/12; Senate Calendar 6 | |
2012-01-19 | Senate Hearing: 1/26/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 4 | |
2012-01-01 | Senate Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 1, Pg.15 |