NH SB98 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB98
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-17 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating the statute of limitations on sexual assault.
Title
Eliminating the statute of limitations on sexual assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/16/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
Same As/Similar To
SB98 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6