NH SB98 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0266; Effective 07/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0266; Effective 07/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing group net metering for limited electrical energy procedures.
Title
Authorizing group net metering for limited electrical energy procedures.
Sponsors
Sen. Molly Kelly [D] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Candace Bouchard [D] | Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Shepardson [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. David Borden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/24/2013; Chapter 0266; Effective 07/24/2013 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2187e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2187e Adopted; House Journal 52, PG.1712 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Prescott Moved Concur with House Amendment #1857h, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1857h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1570-1571 |
2013-06-05 | House | Amendment #1857h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1570-1571 |
2013-05-22 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1857h (New Title); House Calendar42, PG.1450-1451 |
2013-05-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1857h(NT) for June 5 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1429 |
2013-05-15 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/21/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 5/14/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED== |
2013-04-23 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 5/1/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 4/16/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 35, PG.1191 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1080s, 1111s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-1111s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1080s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Sen. Kelly Moved to Remove SB 98 from the Consent Calendar |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1080s, New Title, 3/28/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: === TIME CHANGE === 3/6/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Hearing: 3/6/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |