NH SB96 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 06/02/15; Chapter 0077; Effective 06/02/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 06/02/15; Chapter 0077; Effective 06/02/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the expansion of rights of defense and indemnification under RSA 99-D to proceedings against state employees before professional licensing boards.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the expansion of rights of defense and indemnification under RSA 99-D to proceedings against state employees before professional licensing boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/02/15; Chapter 0077; Effective 06/02/2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1781 |
2015-05-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1750 |
2015-04-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 6 (Vote 11-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG. 1508 |
2015-04-08 | House | Executive Session: 4/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-03-11 | House | Public Hearing: 3/17/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 22, PG. 629 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0061s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0061s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0061s, 2/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/15, Room 100, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |