NH SB93 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - Signed by the Governor on 08/23/2021; Chapter 0219; Effective 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to permanency planning under the child protection act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to permanency planning under the child protection act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-30SenateSigned by the Governor on 08/23/2021; Chapter 0219; Effective 01/01/2022
2021-07-23HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-21SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-07-13SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2055e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-07-12HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2055e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-06-03HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 84
2021-05-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 14-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 15
2021-04-14HousePublic Hearing: 04/21/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93446087542 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-31HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 4 P. 50
2021-03-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0763s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0763s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0763s, 03/18/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2021-01-27SenateRemote Hearing: 02/02/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 9
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback