NH SB93 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0064; Effective 06/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0064; Effective 06/06/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to plumbers and mechanical contractors on state boards.
Title
Relative to plumbers and mechanical contractors on state boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/06/2013; Chapter 0064; Effective 06/06/2013 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (05/02/13) |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-04-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1241 |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 24 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar33, PG.1093 |
2013-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/7/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/6/13, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Dept. & Admin; Senate Journal 4 |