NH SB92 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB92

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0207; Effective 08/07/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the consumer complaint process at the banking department.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the consumer complaint process at the banking department.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-18 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 3 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/08/2018; Chapter 0207; Effective 08/07/2018
2018-05-09HouseEnrolled 05/03/2018
2018-05-09SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17
2018-04-26HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018
2018-04-19HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/26/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4
2018-04-03HouseExecutive Session: 04/10/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/03/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-20HousePublic Hearing: 03/28/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302
2018-03-12HouseIntroduced 03/07/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 50
2018-01-18SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-18SenateSen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-18SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 3Y-21N, Motion Failed; 01/18/2018; Senate Journal 2
2018-01-08SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/18/2018; Senate Calendar 3
2018-01-03SenateSpecial Order to 01/18/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/03/2018 Senate Journal 1
2017-12-11SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48
2017-03-29SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11
2017-03-23SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/29/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2017-01-31SenateHearing: 02/07/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 5

Same As/Similar To

SB92 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback