NH SB92 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 8 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 8 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting multiple prescription drug failures.
Title
Prohibiting multiple prescription drug failures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 8 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) |
2013-10-04 | House | ==Rescheduled== Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/22/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-09-10 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-09-10 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-05-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-05-15 | House | Executive Session: 5/21/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-05-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/21/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 5/1/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 ==RECESSED== |
2013-04-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/23/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/11/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/7/13; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 2/19/13, Room 100, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |