NH SB91 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/05/2015; Chapter 0021; Effective 05/05/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/05/2015; Chapter 0021; Effective 05/05/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to appointment of counsel for indigent defendants.
Title
Relative to appointment of counsel for indigent defendants.
Sponsors
Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Rep. Janet Wall [D] | Rep. Deborah Wheeler [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Rep. Robert Rowe [R] | Rep. David Woodbury [D] | Sen. David Pierce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/05/2015; Chapter 0021; Effective 05/05/2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-29 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 36, PG. 1597 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1546 |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1305 |
2015-04-01 | House | Executive Session: 4/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-03-24 | House | Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 22, PG. 629 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Hearing:=== TIME CHANGE === 1/28/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 12:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |