NH SB91 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Sen. Bradley moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Sen. Bradley moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to drug use not approved by the Food and Drug Administration.
Title
Relative to drug use not approved by the Food and Drug Administration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Sen. Bradley moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/21/13; Senate Calendar 12 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Special Order to 3/21/13, Without Objection, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved to Remove SB 91 from the Consent Calendar; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing: 3/5/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |