NH SB91 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-12 - Senate Chapter 0269; Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-12 - Senate Chapter 0269; Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to automatic fire suppression sprinklers.
Title
Relative to automatic fire suppression sprinklers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-12 - House - SHALL SB 91 BECOME LAW? (Y: 266 N: 61 NV: 71 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - ADOPT COC REPORT #2293C (Y: 284 N: 92 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - OTP/AM 1415H (Y: 223 N: 91 NV: 82 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Senate - Notwithstanding the Governor's veto shall the bill become law? (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - House - ADOPT COC REPORT #2293C (Y: 284 N: 92 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - OTP/AM 1415H (Y: 223 N: 91 NV: 82 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-12 | Senate Chapter 0269; Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-10-12 | House Veto Overridden: Regular Calendar 266-61 by Required Two-Thirds | |
2011-09-07 | Senate Notwithstanding the Governor’s Veto, Shall SB 91 Become Law: Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Veto Overridden by required two-thirds vote; Senate Journal 22, Pg.739 | |
2011-07-13 | Senate Vetoed by Governor 07/13/2011 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1859 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2293c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2011-06-22 | House Conference Committee Report #2293c Adopted, Regular Calendar 284-92; House Journal 57, PG.1812-1815 | |
2011-06-09 | House Conference Committee Report #2011-2293c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 49, PG.1675 | |
2011-06-07 | Senate Conferee Change; Senator Forrester Replaces Senator Merrill; Senate Journal 20, Pg.547 | |
2011-06-02 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/7/2011, 10:30 a.m., Room 100, State House | |
2011-06-01 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Sterling, Ferrante, B.Patten, and Burt; House Journal 48, PG.1669 | |
2011-06-01 | House House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1669 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Barnes, Boutin and Merrill; Senate Journal 18, Pg.390 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Sen. Barnes Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1415h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.390 | |
2011-04-27 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1415h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 223-91; House Journal 40, PG.1375-1377 | |
2011-04-27 | House Amendment #1415h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1375 | |
2011-04-14 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 33, PG.1070 | |
2011-04-14 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-1415h; House Calendar 33, PG.1081 | |
2011-04-14 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1415h for April 27 (Vote 12-5: Regular Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1070 | |
2011-04-06 | House Executive Session: 4/14/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-04-06 | House Public Hearing: 4/12/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-02-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 19, Pg.439 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 6, Pg.61 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 6, Pg.57 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Hearing: 2/1/11, Room 100 State House, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs, Senate Journal 3, Pg.35 |