NH SB90 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to certain disclosures by health care provider facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certain disclosures by health care provider facilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback