NH SB89 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/11; Chapter 0249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/11; Chapter 0249
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to employee leasing companies and establishing a study committee on the procurement of health insurance by employee leasing companies.
Title
Relative to employee leasing companies and establishing a study committee on the procurement of health insurance by employee leasing companies.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Jennifer Coffey [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Rep. Marshall Quandt [R] |
Rep. Matthew Quandt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/11; Chapter 0249 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1860 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2011-2527e, New Title, Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2527e(NT) Adopted; House Journal 57, PG.1858 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2310c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2011-06-22 | House Conference Committee Report #2310c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 57, PG.1812 | |
2011-06-16 | House Conference Committee Report #2011-2310c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 49, PG.1675 | |
2011-06-03 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/7/2011, 3:00 p.m., Room 102, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-06-01 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Hunt, Flanders, Nevins, and Taylor; House Journal 48, PG.1623 | |
2011-06-01 | House House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1623 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Bragdon, Carson and Houde; Senate Journal 18, Pg.390 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Sen. Prescott Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1479h; New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.390 | |
2011-05-04 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1479h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.1483 | |
2011-05-04 | House Amendment #1479h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.1483 | |
2011-05-04 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Pilotte); House Journal 42, PG.1413 | |
2011-04-26 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1479h (New Title); House Calendar 36, PG.1277 | |
2011-04-26 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1479h(NT) for May 4 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 36, PG.1244 | |
2011-04-12 | House Executive Session: 4/21/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2011-04-12 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/21/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 Insurance/Consumer Protection Div | |
2011-03-22 | House Public Hearing: 4/14/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 Insurance/Consumer Protection Div ==Work Session May Follow== | |
2011-03-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 28, Pg.882 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 8, Pg.99 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0720s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.85 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Sen. White Floor Amendment #2011-0720s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.85 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Hearing: 2/8/2011, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Senate Journal 3, Pg.35 |