NH SB88 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-01 - Law Without Signature 09/19/2019; Chapter 344; Effective 11/18/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to registry identification cards under the use of cannabis for therapeutic purposes law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to registry identification cards under the use of cannabis for therapeutic purposes law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - Senate - Veto Override (Y: 238 N: 117 NV: 17 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 263 N: 90 NV: 25 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment Sections 6 and 7 (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-01SenateLaw Without Signature 09/19/2019; Chapter 344; Effective 11/18/2019; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
2019-09-19HouseVeto Overridden 09/19/2019: Regular Calendar 238-117 by Required Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 22 P. 11
2019-09-19SenateNotwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 88 Become Law: Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Veto Overridden by necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
2019-07-16SenateVetoed by Governor 07/12/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Sherman Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1667h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 263-90 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 35
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1667h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 35
2019-05-09HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-09HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1667h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 18-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 9
2019-04-30HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-04-17HouseDivision I Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 72
2019-03-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1210s, Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-21SenateSen. Gray Floor Amendment # 2019-1210s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2019; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2019; Senate Calendar 14
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0606s: Sections 1-5 and 7, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateOught to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0606s: Sections 6 and 7, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateThe Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateSen. Gray Moved to divide the Question on Ought to Pass as Amended # 2019-0606s: Sections 6 and 7; and Sections 1-5 and 7, 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0606s: Line 4 Regular Calendar 9Y-15N, Amendment Failed; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0606s: Lines 1 and 2, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateThe Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-03-07SenateSen. Feltes Moved to divide the Question on Committee Amendment # 2019-0606s: Lines 1 and 2; and Line 4; 03/07/2019; Senate Journal 7
2019-02-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0606s, 03/07/2019; Senate Calendar 12
2019-01-30SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=830&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB88
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=832&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=832
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=832
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=832
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=42&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0088&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB88&ddlsponsors=&lsr=830
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=43&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0088&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB88&ddlsponsors=&lsr=830
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=87&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0088&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB88&ddlsponsors=&lsr=830
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=207&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0088&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB88&ddlsponsors=&lsr=830
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=276&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0088&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB88&ddlsponsors=&lsr=830
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=236&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0088&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB88&ddlsponsors=&lsr=830

Bill Comments

feedback