NH SB85 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - II. Remainder Effective on 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-15 - II. Remainder Effective on 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a broadband matching grant initiative and fund.
Title
Establishing a broadband matching grant initiative and fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0449s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0449s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-15 | Senate | II. Remainder Effective on 07/01/2021 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | I. Sections 2-5 Effective as provided in Section 6 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2021; Chapter 0123 |
2021-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 23 |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/10/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1328h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 68 |
2021-06-03 | House | Amendment # 2021-1328h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 68 |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1328h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 8 |
2021-04-28 | House | Public Hearing: 05/10/2021 10:50 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Finance House Journal 4 P. 51 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/25/2021; Senate Journal 9 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/25/2021; Senate Calendar 16 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0449s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0449s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0449s, 03/04/2021; Senate Calendar 12 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/01/2021, 09:20 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 3 |