NH SB84 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0118; Effective 09/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0118; Effective 09/07/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to village district public bodies.
Title
Relative to village district public bodies.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0118; Effective 09/07/2021 |
2021-07-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 81 |
2021-05-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 17-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 10 |
2021-05-10 | House | Public Hearing: 05/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93597701647 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 4 P. 50 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0558s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0558s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0558s, 03/11/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/01/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 3 |