NH SB84 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Sen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Making appropriations to the department of health and human services for homeless services expansion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making appropriations to the department of health and human services for homeless services expansion.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0815s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0815s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0815s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback