NH SB82 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority of the commissioner of the department of education.
Title
Relative to the authority of the commissioner of the department of education.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Ferreira [R] | Rep. Nick Zaricki [R] | Rep. David Murotake [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 5 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/12/15; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Hearing:=== RESCHEDULED === 2/5/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Hearing:=== CANCELLED === 1/27/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 4 |