NH SB80 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2015; Chapter 0116; Effective 06/08/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2015; Chapter 0116; Effective 06/08/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee on rail trails.
Title
Establishing a committee on rail trails.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Peter Leishman [D] | Rep. Brian Chirichiello [R] | Sen. David Pierce [D] |
Rep. David Kidder [R] | Rep. George Sykes [D] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2015; Chapter 0116; Effective 06/08/2015 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/21/2015); Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-21 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1782 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1635e Adopted, Voice Vote, New Title, (In recess of 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1635-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1778 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Concurs with House Amendment #1217h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1217h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1548-1549 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment #1217h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1548-1549 |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1217h for Apr 15 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1306 |
2015-04-09 | House | Executive Session: 4/7/2015 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-04-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/7/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/31/2015 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-19 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 3/24/2015 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/24/2015 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-11 | House | Public Hearing: 3/18/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 22, PG. 629 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0040s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 4 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0040s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0040s, 1/29/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 1/20/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |