NH SB8 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 06/29/2017; Chapter 0182; Effective 08/28/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to school attendance in towns with no public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to school attendance in towns with no public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - OTPA (Y: 210 N: 147 NV: 14 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-03SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/29/2017; Chapter 0182; Effective 08/28/2017
2017-06-27SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-27HouseEnrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 25
2017-06-21SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2375e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/08/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-20HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2375e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2017 House Journal 18 P. 10
2017-06-08SenateSen. Reagan Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 06/08/2017; Senate Journal 19
2017-06-01HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1786h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-147 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 93
2017-06-01HouseAmendment #2017-1786h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 93
2017-05-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-05-17HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1786h for 06/01/2017 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 12
2017-05-03House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/16/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-04-25House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/02/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2017-03-07HousePublic Hearing: 03/15/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 8 P. 44
2017-02-23SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-9N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
2017-02-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/23/2017; Senate Calendar 11
2017-01-25SenateHearing: 01/31/2017, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 8
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback