NH SB79 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB79
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2740h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2740h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to required reporting on waste reduction.
Title
Relative to required reporting on waste reduction.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2740h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-09-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-05-01 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 04/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1162s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1162s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1162s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB79 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2740h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)