NH SB78 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2015; Chapter 0113; Effective 08/07/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2015; Chapter 0113; Effective 08/07/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to original and youth operators' licenses.
Title
Relative to original and youth operators' licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Sen. David Boutin [R] |
Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Patrick Long [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2015; Chapter 0113; Effective 08/07/2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-06 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1779 |
2015-04-29 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1579 |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 29 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1484 |
2015-04-14 | House | Executive Session: 4/21/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 22, PG. 629 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/19/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Hearing:=== RESCHEDULED === 2/5/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Hearing:=== CANCELLED === 1/27/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |