NH SB758 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulating products containing kratom.
Title
Regulating products containing kratom.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] |
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1079s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1079s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1079s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Hearing: 03/03/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 03:00 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |