NH SB75 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2011; Effective 07/13/2011; Chapter 0248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2011; Effective 07/13/2011; Chapter 0248
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to clarification of part-time service in the state retirement system.
Title
Relative to clarification of part-time service in the state retirement system.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] | Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] |
Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Rep. Daniel Sullivan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2011; Effective 07/13/2011; Chapter 0248 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1859 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2390c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2011-06-22 | House Conference Committee Report #2390c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 57, PG.1808-1809 | |
2011-06-16 | House Conference Committee Report #2011-2390c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 49, PG.1674 | |
2011-06-09 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/14/2011, 10:30 a.m., Room 100, State House | |
2011-06-08 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Hawkins, Cohn, Winter, and Shuler; House Journal 51, PG.1724 | |
2011-06-08 | House House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Reps Hawkins and Weyler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1724 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Groen, Bradley and Larsen; Senate Journal 20, Pg.549 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1577h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.549 | |
2011-06-01 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1641 | |
2011-05-24 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for June 1 (Vote 24-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 43, PG.1498 | |
2011-05-17 | House Executive Session: 5/24/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-05-05 | House Public Hearing: 5/11/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-05-04 | House Referred to Finance; House Journal 42, PG.1488 | |
2011-05-04 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1577h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 276-29; House Journal 42, PG.1488 | |
2011-05-04 | House Amendment #1577h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.1488 | |
2011-05-04 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Bergevin); House Journal 42, PG.1413 | |
2011-04-28 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1577h; House Calendar 36, PG.1276 | |
2011-04-28 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1577h for May 4 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 36, PG.1246 | |
2011-04-13 | House Executive Session: 4/26/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306-308 | |
2011-04-13 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/26/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306-308 | |
2011-04-13 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/21/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305-307 | |
2011-04-13 | House Full Committee Work Session: 4/18/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306-308 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:00 Amendment)== | |
2011-04-06 | House Public Hearing: 4/13/2011 1:00 PM Representative's Hall | |
2011-03-31 | House Introduced and Referred to Special Committee on Public Employee Pensions Reform; House Journal 35, PG.1240 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 11, Pg.239 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1240s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.212 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2011-1240s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.212 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Sen. Bradley moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 11, Pg.211 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.211 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Sen. Bradley Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.211 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Sen. White Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.124 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate Not Voted On | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Hearing: 2/24/11, Room 100, State House, 9:35 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration, Senate Journal 5, Pg.44 |