NH SB74 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Veto Sustained 09/19/2019: Regular Calendar 212-143 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 22 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Veto Sustained 09/19/2019: Regular Calendar 212-143 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 22 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to register of deeds fees used to support the land and community heritage investment program (LCHIP), and establishing a committee to study the economic impact of land conservation and to review the LCHIP surcharge.
Title
Relative to register of deeds fees used to support the land and community heritage investment program (LCHIP), and establishing a committee to study the economic impact of land conservation and to review the LCHIP surcharge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - Veto Override (Y: 212 N: 143 NV: 16 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 136 N: 200 NV: 29 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - OTP (Y: 214 N: 144 NV: 18 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - Veto Override (Y: 212 N: 143 NV: 16 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 136 N: 200 NV: 29 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2019-05-02 - House - OTP (Y: 214 N: 144 NV: 18 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-19 | House | Veto Sustained 09/19/2019: Regular Calendar 212-143 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 22 P. 8 |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 74 Become Law: Regular Calendar 17Y-7N, Veto Overridden by necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22 |
2019-07-16 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 07/12/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2329h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 23 |
2019-06-06 | House | FLAM # 2019-2378h (NT) (Rep. Edwards): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 136-200 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 23 |
2019-06-06 | House | Amendment # 2019-2329h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 23 |
2019-05-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-05-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2329h (NT) for 06/05/2019 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 22 |
2019-05-16 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-05-15 | House | Executive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-144 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 24 |
2019-05-06 | House | Public Hearing: 05/14/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 24 |
2019-04-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-04-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 11 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Special Order to after Energy and Natural Resources, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1054s, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Floor Amendment # 2019-1054s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/05/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |