NH SB730 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the granite state paid family leave plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the granite state paid family leave plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateRefer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7
2020-03-11SenateSpecial Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6
2020-03-04SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10
2020-02-27SenateHearing: 03/03/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 9
2020-01-16SenateIntroduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback